U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00229
  • Case Name: Bear Creek Trail LLC et al v. BOKF NA et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Transcript Letter]
  • January 10, 2023: [USCA Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Transcript Request (No Transcripts Necessary) - Appeal]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 15, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • December 15, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Alter/Amend Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • October 19, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Appendix]
  • September 28, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 28, 2022: [Brief]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Supplemental Designation]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation]
  • June 24, 2022: [Bankruptcy Appeal - Designation]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • May 02, 2022: [Reply Brief]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Objection]
  • April 13, 2022: [Stay Case]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Reply Brief]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 02, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Response]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • December 21, 2021: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Bankruptcy - Record on Appeal]
  • December 16, 2021: [Bankruptcy Appeal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.