U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:21-cv-00232
  • Case Name: Higgins et al v Cheyenne Regional Medical Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [Bill of Costs]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • March 01, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • January 04, 2022: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • December 22, 2021: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.