U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:22-cv-00008
  • Case Name: McCollum et al v Baldwin
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • April 18, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 04, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • January 19, 2022: [Praecipe]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 19, 2022: [Financial Entry]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • January 17, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 17, 2022: [Complaint (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.