U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 0:22-cv-00057
  • Case Name: Yellowbear v. Wyoming Attorney General
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [USCA Order]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [USCA Order]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Appeal Record Retrieved by USCA]
  • April 04, 2022: [USCA Appeal Fees]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Appeal Remark]
  • March 28, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 28, 2022: [Preliminary Record Sent to USCA]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2022: [Dismissing Case]
  • March 17, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.