U.S. District Court for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: L:22-po-00691-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Hughes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 17, 2023: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Status Conference]
  • January 03, 2023: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 30, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
  • November 23, 2022: [Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2022: [Bond]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • October 07, 2022: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • October 07, 2022: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.