U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cv-00255
  • Case Name: Maps Towing & Diesel Repair Inc v. Blue Lines Distribution LTD et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Request for Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Mediation]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • April 07, 2025: [Reply]
  • April 04, 2025: [Opposition]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Return of Subpoena]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2024
  • December 16, 2024: [Answer to Counterclaim]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • January 04, 2023: [Entry of Default]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Civil Case Filing Fee Payment]
  • December 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure]
  • December 06, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.