U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00160-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nollen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • March 21, 2025: [Receipt for Exhibits]
  • March 21, 2025: [Jury Verdict]
  • March 21, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • March 21, 2025: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 21, 2025: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • March 17, 2025: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • March 17, 2025: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 17, 2025: [Trial Witness and Exhibit List]
  • March 17, 2025: [Praecipe for Subpoenas]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • March 14, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 13, 2025: [In Court Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • March 11, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 11, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • March 11, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions - Cited]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 10, 2025: [Objection(s)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • March 10, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • March 10, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions - Cited]
  • March 10, 2025: [Stipulation]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 10, 2025: [James Hearing ]
December, 2024
  • December 20, 2024: [Continue]
November, 2024
  • November 29, 2024: [Notice of Intent - Expert Testimony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.