U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Luna
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 28, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • April 28, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions - Cited]
  • April 28, 2025: [Praecipe for Subpoenas]
  • April 23, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Subpoena(s) Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Subpoena(s) Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 21, 2025: [Status Report]
  • April 21, 2025: [Praecipe for Subpoenas]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Praecipe for Subpoenas]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 15, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 14, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Praecipe for Subpoenas]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Subpoenas]
  • April 09, 2025: [Issuance of Subpoenas]
  • April 08, 2025: [Praecipe for Subpoenas]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 31, 2025: [Suppress]
  • March 27, 2025: [CJA Voucher 20]
January, 2025
  • January 24, 2025: [Waiver]
  • January 16, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.