U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Presentence Report Supporting Documents and Letters]
  • April 22, 2025: [Judgment and Commitment Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Transportation/Subsistence]
  • April 09, 2025: [Transportation/Subsistence]
  • April 07, 2025: [- Ex-Parte Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Revised Presentence Report Recommendations]
  • April 07, 2025: [Presentence Report Revised]
  • April 07, 2025: [Presentence Report Addendum]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice to Exceed Compensation - Ex Parte]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Presentence Report Recommendations]
  • March 17, 2025: [Presentence Report]
January, 2025
  • January 28, 2025: [Prosecutor's Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.