U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00035
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Regional Supplemental Services Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Consent for Electronic Notification (Pro Se)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Disclosure of Corporations]
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • March 27, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 10, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.