U.S. District Court for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00011-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez-Salazar
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Interpreter Used]
  • March 18, 2025: [Preliminary Examination]
  • March 17, 2025: [Bond Report]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [Temporary Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 13, 2025: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • March 13, 2025: [Initial Appearance on Complaint - No JS2]
  • March 13, 2025: [Interpreter Used]
  • March 13, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
  • March 13, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.