U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00208
  • Case Name: Omsberg v. Hydrite Chemical Co
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Stipulation of Facts]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to File Excess Pages Non-Dispositive]
  • March 13, 2025: [File Excess Pages (Non-Dispositive)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.