U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00264
  • Case Name: Navajo Transitional Energy Company et al v. United States Department of Interior et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice Vacating Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 28, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Intervene]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Disclosure of Corporations]
  • March 21, 2025: [Reply]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Response]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time Non-Dispositive]
  • March 13, 2025: [Brief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Intervene]
  • March 13, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 13, 2025: [Extension of Time (Non-Dispositive)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.