U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00079
  • Case Name: Norman et al v. Gordon
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Complexity (Non)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 18, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • March 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.