U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Redman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Revoke - SEALED/PETITION for Warrant for Offender Under Supervision]
  • April 17, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 15, 2025: [Violation Report Recommendations]
  • April 15, 2025: [Violation Memorandum]
  • April 11, 2025: [Detention Pending Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Revoke - Sealed]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [CJA Voucher 21 or 24]
  • March 27, 2025: [CJA Voucher 20]
  • March 18, 2025: [Modify the Conditions or Terms of Supervised Release with Consent of the Offender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.