U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blackburn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 25, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 25, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • April 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
  • April 25, 2025: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 09, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Praecipe for Warrant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.