U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00263
  • Case Name: Bitzan v. Wyoming Department of Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Recusal]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Disclosure of Corporations]
  • March 27, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.