U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Friday-Goggles
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extend]
  • April 02, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 02, 2025: [Grand Jury Transcripts]
  • April 02, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 02, 2025: [Waiver]
  • April 02, 2025: [No Contact Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Bond Report]
  • March 31, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Temporary Detention]
  • March 27, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 27, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • March 27, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.