U.S. District Court for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Romero
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 21, 2025: [Waiver]
  • April 21, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Preliminary Examination]
  • April 21, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Interpreter Used]
  • April 18, 2025: [Bond Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2025: [Temporary Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2025: [Written Consent to Appear by Video Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance on Complaint - No JS2]
  • April 16, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Location Start]
  • April 16, 2025: [Interpreter Used]
  • April 16, 2025: [Speedy Trial - Procedural Interval Start]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Warrant Issued]
  • April 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.