U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00099
  • Case Name: Gold N' Humates LLC v. Trisight LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Requiring Joint Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Discovery Motions and Dispositive Motions]
  • April 24, 2025: [Disclosure of Corporations]
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 24, 2025: [Removal]
  • April 24, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Judge Assignment and Consent to Proceed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Removal (Attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.