U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Wyoming

wyoming Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Wyoming
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20159
  • Case Name: WaterIQ Technologies, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jordan, Trustee Paul Arthur [Proposed Order]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jordan, Trustee Paul Arthur [Exhibit]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jordan, Trustee Paul Arthur [Appear Telephonically or by Video Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jordan, Trustee Paul Arthur [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jordan, Trustee Paul Arthur [341 Meeting Explanation]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jordan, Trustee Paul Arthur [Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jordan, Trustee Paul Arthur [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jordan, Trustee Paul Arthur [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Jordan, Trustee Paul Arthur [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Proposed Order]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 First Day Motions]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Incomplete Filing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Take Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Declaration]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.