U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maryland

maryland Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maryland
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 11-26542
  • Case Name: Dudley Jerome Sienkiewicz and Theresa Lynn Sienkiewicz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2017
  • February 02, 2017: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
November, 2016
  • November 24, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Final Decree and Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • November 22, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Discharging Debtor]
  • November 06, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • November 04, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • November 04, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Debtor's Affidavit Requesting Discharge]
  • November 04, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Affidavit]
  • November 04, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Financial Management Course]
  • November 04, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Case Eligible to Close Without Discharge]
  • November 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
October, 2016
  • October 01, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Thomas, Robert S. [Notice Appointing Standing Trustee]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vetter, Gerard R. (Ch13) [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report (batch)]
  • September 19, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vetter, Gerard R. (Ch13) [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
February, 2016
  • February 08, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Vetter, Gerard R. (Ch13) [Notice Appointing Interim Trustee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.