Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Closing Case (transferred or miscellaneous)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Closing Case (Chapter 7 No Asset)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Court Certificate of Mailing re Discharge of Debtor, Chapter 7 - BNC]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Discharge of Debtor(s), Chapter 7 (BNC)]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [BNC Service Date & Opposition (ADI)]
    Date Published:May 28, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Court Certificate of Mailing: 21- BNC]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Report of No Distribution by Chapter 7 Trustee - No Funds]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Abandonment of Property (Notice) (CSD 2065) (BNC)]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [~Generic~ Motion]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Withdraw Document (Motion)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Initial Report by Chapter 7 Trustee]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Meeting of Creditors (Notice of Continuance)]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Creditors Added by Amendment (Notice) (CSD 1101)]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Sanctions (Motion)]
    Date Published:April 08, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Complaint (fee)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Financial Management - Certificate of Debtor Education]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Undeliverable Mail]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Amendment (CSD 1100)(fee)]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Statement of Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (Ch7)(122A-1Supp)]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Receipt of Final Installment Payment]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Waiver of the Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Order) (CSD 1021)]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Court Certificate of Mailing re Notice Regarding Interpreters - BNC]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Court Certificate of Mailing re Notice of Incomplete Schedules Due- BNC]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Court Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (ADI)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Missing Schedule(s), Statement(s) and/or Plan Deadlines (Notice) (BNC)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Photo Identification for Persons Filing a Petition without Attorney (secured image)(BNC)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Waiver of the Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Application) (CSD 1020)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Statement About Your Social Security Number (121) (secured image)]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [CASB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of California
    Case Number:16-01362-CL7
    Party Name:Jaime Ylasco Clavito
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Gladstone, Leslie T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(fee) internal]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.casb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?410296

Post Your Comment or Question

2 x 1 =