open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of California
    Case Number:3:19-cv-01789
    Party Name:Bonilla v. San Joaquin County
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Notice re: IFP]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:April 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis PSP]
    Date Published:August 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Civil Case]
    Date Published:March 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Notice]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Notice re: IFP]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
    Date Published:March 01, 2018
  • Source: https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?323360
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =