Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia

  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Columbia
    Case Number:1:17-cv-01154
    Party Name:BLUMENTHAL et al v. TRUMP
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certification for Interlocatory Appeal]
    Date Published:October 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Opinion]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of QC]
    Date Published:August 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:July 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplemental Memorandum]
    Date Published:April 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Clarify]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clarify]
    Date Published:April 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amicus Brief]
    Date Published:March 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:March 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:March 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
    Date Published:December 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to opposition to motion]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:November 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to motion]
    Date Published:October 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:September 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:July 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [.Order]
    Date Published:July 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to]
    Date Published:July 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Summons to Issue]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Not Issued]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Electronic Summons Issued]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.dcd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?187220
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =