open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:1:13-cr-00015-6
    Party Name:UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DONALDSON et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
    Date Published:May 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:September 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Amended Motion]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel]
    Date Published:March 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reducing Sentence - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:September 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:May 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 09, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:May 21, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:May 14, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?88705
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =