open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:16-10143
    Party Name:Billie Jo Peacock
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Default on Motion (Dismiss)]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held-Motion to Dismiss-CD]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Payroll Deduction (Amended)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Modify Plan After Confirmation]
    Date Published:November 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Continued without follow-up]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Trustee)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held and Continued to Final Disposition Calendar]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Hearing Held-Plan Confirmable AEC]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Extend Automatic Stay]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Payroll Deduction]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hurst, Kristin [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?324815
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =