open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:12-50086
    Party Name:Rita B. Schrader
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice of Certification of Plan Completion and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice to File Form 423 - Supplemental Notice Ch 13 Only]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice to Debtor Regarding Certification of Plan Completion (1st NOTICE)]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Continued without follow-up]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case (Other) (batch)(Trustee)]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Hearing Set on Complaint]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:September 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Modify Plan After Confirmation]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Trustee)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?318151
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =