open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:11-53558
    Party Name:Lamont A Williams
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice of Certification of Plan Completion and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice to Debtor Regarding Certification of Plan Completion (1st NOTICE)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice to File Form 423 - Supplemental Notice Ch 13 Only]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Trustee)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?316256
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =