open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:13-53004
    Party Name:Suzette Henderson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Final Decree; Case Closed]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Discharging Debtor]
    Date Published:August 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:July 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice of Certification of Plan Completion and Request for Discharge]
    Date Published:July 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Notice to Debtor Regarding Certification of Plan Completion (1st NOTICE)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Hope, Camille [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?337688
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =