open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia
    Case Number:11-52790
    Party Name:El Cotija Mexican Restaurant, Inc.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Chapter 11 Final Decree]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:January 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Memo Regarding Monthly Report]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 11 [Response With Opposition]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?313986
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =