open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:13-22609-jrs
    Party Name:Lori Ann Gibbs
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Discharging Debtor and Closing Estate (182)]
    Date Published:May 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Certification of Financial Management Course for Debtor]
    Date Published:May 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Re: Financial Mgmt. Cert.]
    Date Published:April 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Notice to Debtor Regarding Financial Management Certificate Due]
    Date Published:April 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion for Relief from Stay (401)]
    Date Published:March 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Relief from Stay, Motion for]
    Date Published:March 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Order re: request for 521 dismissal]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:March 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Meeting of Creditors Held and Concluded]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Approving Trustee's Report (206)]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Order Discharging 12/13 Trustee - Case Converted]
    Date Published:February 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Trustees (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [00-Motion for Relief from Stay (FEE)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [Notice]
    Date Published:February 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Patten, Bradley J. [03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7 - Individual - No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Amendment to Schedules D, E, F and/or E/F (FEE)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Declaration of Debtor]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [0-Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Schedule J]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Schedule I]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Schedule H]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Schedule G]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Schedule F]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Schedule E]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Schedule D]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Schedule C]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Schedule B]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [P-Schedule A]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [First Request to Convert from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (FEE)]
    Date Published:January 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Reconsider Order of Dismissal, Motion to]
    Date Published:August 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Dismissing Case.]
    Date Published:August 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [07-Order Dismissing Ch. 13 Case - MTD Hearing Held]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [05-Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (FOR OTHER)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Notice]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Determination of Status of Claim, Motion for]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?977659
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =