open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:13-40645-bem
    Party Name:Robert Lewis Thomas, Jr and Karen Leigh Thomas
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Discharging Debtor and Closing Estate (182)]
    Date Published:May 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Discharged]
    Date Published:May 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [01-Order Discharging Ch. 7 Debtor and Closing Estate]
    Date Published:May 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [0-Reaffirmation Agreement -- (No Undue Hardship)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [Notice]
    Date Published:March 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Approving Trustee's Report (206)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Defer Entry of Discharge (436)]
    Date Published:February 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [Order Discharging 12/13 Trustee - Case Converted]
    Date Published:February 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [Trustees (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:February 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [Defer Entry of Discharge, Motion to]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [Order re: request for 521 dismissal]
    Date Published:January 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:January 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [Meeting of Creditors Held but Continued]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [0-Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [P-Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [P-Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [P-Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [P-Schedule J]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [P-Schedule I]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [P-Schedule H]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [P-Schedule G]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [P-Schedule E/F]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [P-Schedule D]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [P-Schedule C]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [P-Schedule A/B]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [P-Declaration of Debtor]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [P-Attorney Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [Extend Time to File Schedules, Motion to]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [Extend Time to File Schedules, Application to]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [03-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7 - Individual - No Asset)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Richardson, Thomas D. [07-First Request to Conv. From 13 to 7 Granted]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [First Request to Convert from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7 (FEE)]
    Date Published:November 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [0-Withdrawal of Document]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Vacate Dismissal Order (485,562,564)]
    Date Published:October 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Vacating Dismissal Order]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:September 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Vacate Dismissal Order (FEE), Motion to]
    Date Published:September 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:June 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Closing 13 Dismissed]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Trustees (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [06-Order Dismissing Ch. 13 Case - Failure to Comply]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Trustees Supplemental Report Requesting Dismissal]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case (403)]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Dismiss for Failure to Make Plan Payments, Motion to]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Trustee's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Order Approving Modification of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Amended Plan]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [03-Chapter 13 - Post-Confirmation Plan Modification/Notice]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Employer Deduction Order]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [08-Application for Compensation]
    Date Published:July 30, 2014
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Townson, Mary Ida [Loan Modification, Motion for]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?956363
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =