open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:17-71701-jrs
    Party Name:Kenyata Rekeller Ruffin
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Dismissing Case.]
    Date Published:March 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [06-Order Dismissing Ch. 13 Case - Failure to Comply]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice to Debtor Re: Financial Mgmt. Cert.]
    Date Published:March 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Notice to Debtor Regarding Financial Management Certificate Due]
    Date Published:March 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Notice Rescheduling Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Notice Rescheduling Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:January 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Letter Re: Outstanding Filing Fee]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Letter to Debtor re: Unpaid Filing Fees]
    Date Published:January 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Closing Estate]
    Date Published:December 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [06-Close Bankruptcy Case - Dismissed]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Order Closing 13 Dismissed]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Trustees (12/13) Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Dismissing Case for failure to pay filing fee (173)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [06-Order Dismissing Case (Failure to Pay Filing Fee)]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Ch. 13 Meeting of Creditors Not Held]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Notice of Filing Fee Deficiency]
    Date Published:November 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Notice of Deficiency - Filing Fee (30 day)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Meeting of Creditors Reset - Ch. 13]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order Granting Application to Pay Filing Fees]
    Date Published:October 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:October 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [02g-Order Granting Application (Paid in Installments)]
    Date Published:October 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [Autodocket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:October 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Whaley, Nancy J. [02-Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 13) and Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:October 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [02-Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Initial Docs01: Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [01 - Chapter 13 Plan - Initial Plan]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement of SSN/ITIN (B121) (**Do NOT select this event with other events**)]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Credit Counseling Service Certificate]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Goodman, Dale R. F. [Order re: request for 521 dismissal]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?950503
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =