open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Georgia
    Case Number:14-50813-bem
    Party Name:Millicent Shields
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
    Date Published:September 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Reopen Case, Motion to]
    Date Published:September 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Certificate of Mailing by BNC of Order and Notice]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Order and Notice]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Application for Waiver of Chapter 7 Filing Fee (103B)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Reopen Case (FEE), Motion to]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lubin, Jordan E. [Relief from Stay, Motion for]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.ganb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?989285
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =