open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia

GEORGIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Georgia
    Case Number:13-21361-
    Party Name:Jeanna Griffin
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Discharging Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:July 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Consent Order]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Release of Wages (trustee generated)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Massey, M. Elaina [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.gasb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?284042
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =