U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:05-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • March 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
August, 2016
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2015
  • May 06, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.