U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:12-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion Rule 60(b) Relief from Judgment or Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 06, 2018: [Order]
February, 2017
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 27, 2016: [Order]
May, 2015
  • May 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.