U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:94-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Austin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 22, 2020: [Order to Surrender]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 20, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 06, 2020: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 10, 2019: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 03, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: [Order]
May, 2015
  • May 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.