U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. POTTS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Judgment]
June, 2020
  • June 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Order]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order]
  • June 13, 2018: [Order]
January, 2017
  • January 06, 2017: [Order]
November, 2016
  • November 18, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 05, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
August, 2016
  • August 02, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • August 01, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
January, 2016
  • January 04, 2016: [Order on Motion to Postpone]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order to Surrender]
May, 2015
  • May 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.