U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:13-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PHILPOT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [First Step Act Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 24, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
March, 2017
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2015
  • December 15, 2015: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2015: [Order]
  • December 09, 2015: [Order to Surrender]
November, 2015
  • November 05, 2015: [Order]
May, 2015
  • May 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.