U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TURNER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 12, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2016
  • April 21, 2016: [Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 22, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 22, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2015
  • July 24, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 20, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 17, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 15, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.