U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00034-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HULING et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 12, 2019: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: [Petition and Order Re Restitution Agreement]
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 09, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2017: [Order to Surrender]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 24, 2016: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2016: [Order to Surrender]
August, 2016
  • August 22, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
March, 2016
  • March 21, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Strike]
January, 2016
  • January 26, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 19, 2016: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2015
  • December 09, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2015
  • July 08, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 23, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 18, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 18, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 17, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 17, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.