U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00037-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MITCHELL et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2015
  • August 28, 2015: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • August 20, 2015: [Order for Return of Registry Funds]
  • August 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2015
  • June 18, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 18, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.