U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Judgment]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2016
  • December 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2016
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 10, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
October, 2016
  • October 26, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 20, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Judgment]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 06, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.