U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ELLISON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Order of Detention]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
September, 2016
  • September 21, 2016: [Judgment]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Sealed Motion]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2015
  • July 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 06, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.