U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RIVERS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2016
  • November 02, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
September, 2016
  • September 15, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2016
  • January 07, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Amended Motion]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2015
  • August 05, 2015: [Order on Motion to Strike]
July, 2015
  • July 14, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 06, 2015: [Order of Detention]
  • July 01, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
June, 2015
  • June 24, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.