U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BOWEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2015
  • July 29, 2015: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 01, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
June, 2015
  • June 25, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 23, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.