U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HALL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order]
January, 2016
  • January 29, 2016: [Amended Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 20, 2015: [Judgment]
September, 2015
  • September 28, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 23, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2015
  • July 06, 2015: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 06, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 06, 2015: [Order of Detention]
June, 2015
  • June 23, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • June 19, 2015: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.