U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:15-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CLARKE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2020
  • October 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 28, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • January 13, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 21, 2019: [Order Regarding Motion for Sentence Reduction - FIRST STEP ACT]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Detention]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
May, 2017
  • May 01, 2017: [Judgment]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
November, 2016
  • November 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • November 10, 2016: [Judgment]
October, 2016
  • October 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
September, 2016
  • September 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 21, 2016: [Judgment]
  • September 09, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2016
  • July 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2016
  • June 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2016
  • May 17, 2016: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 13, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2016
  • February 29, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 17, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2015
  • December 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 18, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 12, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2015
  • October 16, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 16, 2015: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2015
  • September 15, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2015
  • August 07, 2015: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 07, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 07, 2015: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
July, 2015
  • July 23, 2015: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.